NV AB142 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - In Assembly. To enrollment.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; eliminating the statute of limitations for the prosecution of sexual assault if the identity of the person accused of committing the crime is established by DNA evidence; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminates the statute of limitations for the prosecution of sexual assault in certain circumstances. (BDR 14-175)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time.
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-22SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-22SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-19AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2019-04-19AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-18AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 390.) To printer.
2019-04-17AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-14AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback