NV AB140 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 484.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 484.
Summary
Makes various changes to provisions relating to foreclosures of real property. (BDR 2-228)
Title
Makes various changes to provisions relating to foreclosures of real property. (BDR 2-228)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-09 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 484. | |
2009-06-02 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-06-01 | To enrollment. | |
2009-06-01 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. | |
2009-06-01 | To printer. | |
2009-06-01 | Conference report adopted by Senate. | |
2009-06-01 | From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 771 and further amend. Conference report adopted by Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee. | |
2009-05-28 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendment No. 771 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly. | |
2009-05-22 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-22 | Senate Amendment No. 771 not concurred in. To Senate. | |
2009-05-22 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-21 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 771.) To printer. | |
2009-05-19 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-21 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. | |
2009-04-21 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-21 | To Senate. | |
2009-04-21 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-20 | To printer. | |
2009-04-20 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 11, Excused: 1.) | |
2009-04-20 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-04-20 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2009-04-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 432.) | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-20 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-23 | Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption. | |
2009-03-02 | Notice of exemption. | |
2009-02-09 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-02-06 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=301 |