NV AB132 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 199. (Effective October 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 199. (Effective October 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health; requiring the Clark County Board of County Commissioners to establish a Regional Opioid Task Force to study certain issues relating to opioid overdose fatalities; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Requires the establishment of a Regional Opioid Task Force in Clark County. (BDR S-721)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 199. (Effective October 1, 2023) |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 610 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 610.) To printer. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 5.) To Senate. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 172.) To printer. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-02-21 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |