NV AB125 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to offenders; allowing certain offenders to have credits deducted from the minimum term or minimum aggregate term imposed by a sentence; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to credits against sentences of offenders. (BDR 16-233)
Sponsors
Rep. Bea Duran [D] | Sen. Rochelle Nguyen [D] | Sen. Edgar Flores [D] | Rep. Howard Watts [D] |
Rep. Sarah Peters [D] | Rep. Selena Torres [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | To committee. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 141.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-02 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |