NV AB123 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-18 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; requiring certain information regarding exemptions from immunization requirements for pupils to be maintained by a school district, charter school or private school; requiring notification to the parent or guardian of a pupil enrolled in a public or private school concerning certain outbreaks; requiring notification to the Division of Public and Behavioral Health of the Department of Health and Human Services concerning the number of children who receive such exemptions; prescribing the duration of exemptions from immunization requirements; requiring an annual statement regarding certain medical exemptions to be submitted to the board of trustees of a school district or the governing body of a school; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the requirements concerning immunizations of pupils for purposes of enrollment in school. (BDR 34-593)

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-18Senate(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
2019-04-19SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
2019-04-19SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-18AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-17AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 124.) To printer.
2019-04-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-12AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-11AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback