NV AB104 | 2017 | 79th Legislature


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]


Makes various changes relating to elections. (BDR 24-184)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Makes various changes relating to elections. (BDR 24-184)



2017-06-06Assembly(No further action taken.)
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-24AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 516.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2017-04-24AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-02-08AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-02-07AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
2017-02-07AssemblyPrefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).

Nevada State Sources

Bill Comments