NM SM92 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Review nm telecomm statutes
Title
Review nm telecomm statutes
Sponsors
Sen. Phil Griego [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | House | [LD 19] Signed by one or both houses |
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Rules |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation |