NM SM63 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Passed Senate (26-13) Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Passed Senate (26-13) Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tobacco-free college campuses
Title
Tobacco-free college campuses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Passed Senate (26-13) Signed by one or both houses. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Referred to Senate Education |
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Referred to Senate Rules |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Education |