NM SM60 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - [LD 20] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - [LD 20] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduce School Food Waste
Title
Reduce School Food Waste
Sponsors
Sen. Gay Kernan [R] | Sen. Mimi Stewart [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | [LD 20] Signed by one or both houses |
2018-02-15 | Senate | [LD 20] Passed Senate (35-0) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Education |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 17] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Rules |
2018-01-30 | Senate | [LD 9] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Education |