NM SM45 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-12)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Senator Carlos R. Cisneros Memorial Hwy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senator Carlos R. Cisneros Memorial Hwy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0
2020-02-15SenateSCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-02-12SenateSRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-02-04SenateSent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SCORC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback