NM SM34 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-05 - [LD 18] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-05 - [LD 18] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eddy-lea Energy Alliance Storage Facility
Title
Eddy-lea Energy Alliance Storage Facility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | Senate | [LD 18] Signed by one or both houses |
2016-02-05 | House | [LD 18] Passed Senate (27-10) |
2016-02-05 | House | [LD 18] Motion to reconsider previous action adopted |
2016-02-05 | Senate | [LD 18] Passed Senate (23-7) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-28 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2016-01-28 | Senate | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-21 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2016-01-21 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation |