NM SM3 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - [LD 51] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Remove marriage penalty for certain people

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Remove marriage penalty for certain people

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-31House[LD 51] Signed by one or both houses
2015-03-31Senate[LD 51] Passed Senate (39-0)
2015-01-30Senate[LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted
2015-01-26Senate[LD 5] Referred to Senate Public Affairs
2015-01-26Senate[LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted
2015-01-20Senate[LD 1] Referred to Senate Rules
2015-01-20Senate[LD 1] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs
2015-01-20Senate[LD 1] Senate Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback