NM SM27 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-09 - [LD 22] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-09 - [LD 22] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Study Low-cost Loans To State Employees
Title
Study Low-cost Loans To State Employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | House | [LD 22] Signed by one or both houses |
2016-02-09 | Senate | [LD 22] Passed Senate (24-10) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Rules |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=M&legno=27&year=16 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/16%20Regular/memorials/senate/SM027.pdf |