NM SM22 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Passed Senate (20-12) Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Passed Senate (20-12) Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Study tobacco use & employer costs
Title
Study tobacco use & employer costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Passed Senate (20-12) Signed by one or both houses. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | [LD 18] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-31 | Senate | [LD 13] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2013-01-31 | Senate | [LD 13] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-17 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Rules |
2013-01-17 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs |