NM SM12 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 19] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 19] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Data Breach Notification Act Compliance
Title
Data Breach Notification Act Compliance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | [LD 19] Signed by one or both houses |
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-07 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2018-02-07 | Senate | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-22 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Rules |
2018-01-22 | Senate | [LD 5] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |