NM SM1 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medicare Coverage For Lymphedema
Title
Medicare Coverage For Lymphedema
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:32 N:0 |
2020-02-08 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-31 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SPAC |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |