NM SJR4 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-19 - [LD 26] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Land grant permanent fund changes, ca

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land grant permanent fund changes, ca

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-19 [LD 26] Action postponed indefinitely
2012-02-19 [LD 26] Do pass committee report adopted
2012-02-17 [LD 24] Referred to House Judiciary
2012-02-17 [LD 24] Do pass committee report adopted
2012-02-08 [LD 17] Referred to House Voters & Elections
2012-02-08 [LD 17] Assigned to House Voters & Elections and then to House Judiciary
2012-02-02 [LD 13] Passed Senate (30-8)
2012-01-27 [LD 9] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2012-01-20 [LD 4] Referred to Senate Finance
2012-01-20 [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted
2012-01-20 [LD 4] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2012-01-20 [LD 4] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2012-01-17 [LD 1] Referred to Senate Rules
2012-01-17 [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance
2012-01-17 [LD 1] Senate Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback