NM SJR2 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-30 - [LD 12] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-30 - [LD 12] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Permanent Funds For Childhood Education, Ca
Title
Permanent Funds For Childhood Education, Ca
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Finance |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Rules |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |