NM SJR19 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-10 - [LD 23] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-10 - [LD 23] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pecos Valley Land Sale
Title
Pecos Valley Land Sale
Sponsors
Sen. Gay Kernan [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | Senate | [LD 23] Signed by one or both houses |
2016-02-10 | House | [LD 23] Passed House (55-1) |
2016-02-04 | House | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-01 | House | [LD 14] Referred to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Passed Senate (36-0) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-28 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2016-01-28 | Senate | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Rules |
2016-01-25 | Senate | [LD 7] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Conservation |