NM SJR13 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-10 - [LD 23] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-10 - [LD 23] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Las Vegas Land Transfer
Title
Las Vegas Land Transfer
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Campos [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | Senate | [LD 23] Signed by one or both houses |
2016-02-10 | House | [LD 23] Passed House (54-0) |
2016-02-04 | House | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Referred to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs |
2016-02-05 | Senate | [LD 18] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-28 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Finance |
2016-01-28 | Senate | [LD 10] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Rules |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Finance |