NM SJM7 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-08 - [LD 17] Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-08 - [LD 17] Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
"behavioral health day"
Title
"behavioral health day"
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Papen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Signed by one or both houses. | |
2012-02-15 | [LD 22] Passed House (62-0) | |
2012-02-15 | [LD 22] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action | |
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] On the Speaker's table by rule (temporary calendar)abled temporarily by motion and then to H | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Passed Senate (32-0) | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action | |
2012-01-17 | [LD 1] On the Speaker's table by rule (temporary calendar)abled temporarily by motion and then to S | |
2012-01-17 | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |