NM SJM6 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Abe Chavez Jr Memorial Highway
Title
Abe Chavez Jr Memorial Highway
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2020-02-18 | House | HTPWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-12 | House | Sent to HTPWC - Referrals: HTPWC |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0 |
2020-02-08 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-04 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SCORC |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |