NM SJM6 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-12 - [LD 17] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-12 - [LD 17] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health care work force working group
Title
Health care work force working group
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Signed by one or both houses |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (70-0) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs |
2014-01-31 | Senate | [LD 9] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2014-01-29 | Senate | [LD 7] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-01-27 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2014-01-27 | Senate | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-21 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Rules |
2014-01-21 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs |
2014-01-21 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |