NM SJM46 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 51] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 51] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reimbursement of home & community-based svcs
Title
Reimbursement of home & community-based svcs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 51] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 51] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 50] Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Passed Senate (32-0) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-13 | Senate | [LD 22] Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-02-13 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Rules |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Finance |