NM SJM35 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-18 - [LD 25] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-18 - [LD 25] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Uneaten school fruits to senior programs
Title
Uneaten school fruits to senior programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-18 | [LD 25] Action postponed indefinitely | |
2012-02-18 | [LD 25] Referred to House Education | |
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Passed Senate (33-0) | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Referred to Senate Education | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Rules | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Education |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=JM&legno=35&year=12 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/12%20Regular/memorials/senate/SJM035.pdf |