NM SJM3 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-06 - [LD 13] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-06 - [LD 13] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cyfd foster care reports to legislature
Title
Cyfd foster care reports to legislature
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | Senate | [LD 13] Signed by one or both houses |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (62-1) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-01-29 | Senate | [LD 7] Passed Senate (32-5) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-01-21 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Rules |
2014-01-21 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs |
2014-01-21 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |