NM SJM29 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Visit challenger learning center
Title
Visit challenger learning center
Sponsors
Sen. John Ryan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | [LD 52] DP API. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] HEC | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] PASSED/S (30-0) | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] DP | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] DP-SEC | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] SRC/SEC-SRC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=JM&legno=29&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/memorials/senate/SJM029.pdf |