NM SJM28 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
University economic development assoc. summit
Title
University economic development assoc. summit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Signed by one or both houses |
2014-02-14 | House | [LD 19] Passed House (63-0) |
2014-02-07 | House | [LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Passed Senate (36-0) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Tabled temporarily by motion and then to S |