NM SJM27 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] HLC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] HLC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal government land grant negotiations
Title
Federal government land grant negotiations
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Lopez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | [LD 52] HLC API. | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] PASSED/S (32-0) | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] DP | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] DP-SCONC | |
2011-02-02 | [LD 16] SRC/SCONC-SRC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=JM&legno=27&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/memorials/senate/SJM027.pdf |