NM SJM23 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protect Indian Health Care Improvement Act
Title
Protect Indian Health Care Improvement Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-29 | Senate | [LD 13] Signed by one or both houses |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (67-0) |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] HSIVC |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] HSIVC |
2017-02-03 | Senate | [LD 18] Passed Senate (36-0) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-30 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs |
2017-01-30 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Rules |
2017-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs |