NM SJM21 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Navajo electrification demo program funding
Title
Navajo electrification demo program funding
Sponsors
Sen. John Pinto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] SGND. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] PASSED/H (65-0) | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] DP | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] HAFC | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] DP - PASSED/S (37-0) | |
2011-02-06 | [LD 20] DP-SRC | |
2011-01-29 | [LD 12] SIAC/SRC-SIAC |