NM SJM20 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - [LD 32] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - [LD 32] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Support For Standing Rock Sioux Tribe
Title
Support For Standing Rock Sioux Tribe
Sponsors
Sen. John Pinto [D] | Sen. Benny Shendo [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Signed by one or both houses |
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (34-30) |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] HSIVC |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] HSIVC |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Passed Senate (29-8) |
2017-02-05 | Senate | [LD 20] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-02-03 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs |
2017-02-03 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs |
2017-02-03 | Senate | [LD 18] Assigned toerred to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs |
2017-02-03 | Senate | [LD 18] re |
2017-02-02 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-29 | Senate | [LD 13] Referred to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs |
2017-01-29 | Senate | [LD 13] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Rules |
2017-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs |