NM SJM17 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - [LD 9] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Review Fcc Net Neutrality Repeal

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Review Fcc Net Neutrality Repeal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13House[LD 9] Action postponed indefinitely
2018-02-13House[LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted
2018-02-13House[LD 9] HLEDC
2018-02-13House[LD 9] HLEDC
2018-02-12Senate[LD 18] Passed Senate (22-12)
2018-02-12Senate[LD 18] Do pass committee report adopted
2018-02-09Senate[LD 14] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation
2018-02-09Senate[LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted
2018-01-26Senate[LD 7] Referred to Senate Rules
2018-01-26Senate[LD 7] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback