NM SJM15 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Interim film investment committee
Title
Interim film investment committee
Sponsors
Sen. Phil Griego [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] SGND. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] PASSED/H (37-25) | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] DP | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] HTRC | |
2011-02-02 | [LD 16] fl/a- PASSED/S (29-3) | |
2011-01-29 | [LD 12] DP | |
2011-01-22 | [LD 5] DP-SCORC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] SRC/SCORC-SRC |