NM SJM10 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-14 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-14 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Career Technical Education Task Force
Title
Career Technical Education Task Force
Sponsors
Sen. Gay Kernan [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2020-02-14 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-02-12 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:35 N:0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SEC |