NM SB96 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 176 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 176 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Conviction Info On Job Applications
Title
Conviction Info On Job Applications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 176 - Apr. 3 |
2019-03-11 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:45 N:15 |
2019-03-10 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-05 | House | HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-24 | House | Sent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC/HSEIC |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:28 N:11 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Floor substitute adopted |
2019-02-14 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-01-25 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SJC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |