NM SB96 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on February 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - [LD 28] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Campaign Finance Fixes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign Finance Fixes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-13Senate[LD 28] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Vetoed by the Governor and date.
2017-01-28House[LD 12] Passed House (41-24)
2017-01-28House[LD 12] Floor amendment adopted
2017-01-28House[LD 12] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2017-01-22House[LD 6] Referred to House Judiciary
2017-01-22House[LD 6] Referred to House Judiciary
2017-01-28Senate[LD 12] Passed Senate (36-6)
2017-01-28Senate[LD 12] Floor amendment adopted
2017-01-26Senate[LD 10] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted
2017-01-26Senate[LD 10] Do not pass committee report adopted
2017-01-20Senate[LD 4] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2017-01-20Senate[LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-01-17Senate[LD 1] Referred to Senate Rules
2017-01-17Senate[LD 1] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary
2017-01-17Senate[LD 1] Senate Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback