NM SB96 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] s/cncrd POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] s/cncrd POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allow inmate telecomm use fees
Title
Allow inmate telecomm use fees
Sponsors
Sen. Rod Adair [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] s/cncrd POCKET VETO. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] w/o rec/a-HJC- w/drn - PASSED/H (46-0) | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] HCPAC/HJC-HCPAC | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] fl/a- PASSED/S (25-14) | |
2011-02-07 | [LD 21] DNP-CS/DP | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] DP/a-SFC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] SJC/SFC-SJC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] SPREF |