NM SB91 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 77
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 77
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Childhood Sexual Abuse Damage Limits
Title
Childhood Sexual Abuse Damage Limits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-29 | Senate | [LD 13] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 77 |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (50-16) |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-02-13 | Senate | [LD 28] Passed Senate (35-0) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-23 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-23 | Senate | [LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |