NM SB9 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-01 - [LD 14] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-01 - [LD 14] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State Budget Request Sub-programs
Title
State Budget Request Sub-programs
Sponsors
Rep. Gail Chasey [D] | Sen. Sander Rue [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | House | [LD 14] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-02-01 | House | [LD 14] Referred to House Ways & Means |
2016-02-01 | House | [LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-28 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs |
2016-01-28 | House | [LD 10] Assigned to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs and then to House Ways & Means |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2016-01-29 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Finance |
2016-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Finance |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |