NM SB72 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 17 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Senate has concurred with House Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Pera Solvency

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pera Solvency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18SenateSenate has concurred with House Amendments
2020-02-17HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:40 N:28
2020-02-14HouseHAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2020-02-12HouseSent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC
2020-02-12SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:25 N:15
2020-02-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment
2020-02-10SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2020-01-31SenateSPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2020-01-23SenateSCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session
2020-01-22SenateSent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SPAC/SFC
2020-01-21SenateSent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback