NM SB72 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - [LD 14] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 44
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Right To Farm & Operations As Nuisance

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Right To Farm & Operations As Nuisance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-01Senate[LD 14] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 44
2016-02-01House[LD 14] Passed House (39-29)
2016-01-30House[LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted
2016-01-29House[LD 11] Referred to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife
2016-02-02Senate[LD 15] Passed Senate (29-11)
2016-01-30Senate[LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted
2016-01-26Senate[LD 8] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2016-01-26Senate[LD 8] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2016-01-21Senate[LD 3] Referred to Senate Conservation
2016-01-21Senate[LD 3] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session
2016-01-19Senate[LD 1] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee
2016-01-19Senate[LD 1] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Judiciary
2016-01-19Senate[LD 1] Senate Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback