NM SB71 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-19 - [LD 26] Passed House (67-1) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Interlocks for certain crime convictions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interlocks for certain crime convictions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-19 [LD 26] Passed House (67-1) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
2012-02-19 [LD 26] Do pass committee report adopted
2012-02-17 [LD 24] Referred to House Judiciary
2012-02-17 [LD 24] Do pass committee report adopted
2012-02-10 [LD 19] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs
2012-02-10 [LD 19] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary
2012-02-02 [LD 13] Passed Senate (38-0)
2012-02-02 [LD 13] Floor amendment adopted
2012-02-02 [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted
2012-01-24 [LD 6] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2012-01-24 [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted
2012-01-20 [LD 4] Referred to Senate Public Affairs
2012-01-20 [LD 4] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session
2012-01-17 [LD 1] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee
2012-01-17 [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary
2012-01-17 [LD 1] Senate Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback