NM SB68 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-02 - [LD 15] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 61
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-02 - [LD 15] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 61
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Family Support Act Effective Date
Title
Uniform Family Support Act Effective Date
Sponsors
Sen. John Ryan [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 61 |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Passed House (69-0) |
2016-01-31 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-26 | House | [LD 8] Referred to House Safety & Civil Affairs |
2016-01-26 | House | [LD 8] Assigned to House Safety & Civil Affairs and then to House Judiciary |
2016-01-29 | Senate | [LD 11] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-21 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-01-21 | Senate | [LD 3] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |