NM SB643 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 25 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - [LD 47] Passed House (64-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.145.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Voter registration requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter registration requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-25House[LD 47] Passed House (64-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.145.
2015-03-24House[LD 46] Do pass committee report adopted
2015-03-19House[LD 43] Referred to House Judiciary
2015-03-17Senate[LD 41] Passed Senate (34-0)
2015-03-17Senate[LD 41] Floor amendment adopted
2015-03-13Senate[LD 39] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted
2015-03-13Senate[LD 39] Do not pass committee report adopted
2015-02-18Senate[LD 22] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2015-02-18Senate[LD 22] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2015-02-02Senate[LD 10] Referred to Senate Rules
2015-02-02Senate[LD 10] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback