NM SB64 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 37 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 37 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Records Pertaining To Certain Claims
Title
Public Records Pertaining To Certain Claims
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 37 - Mar. 4 |
2020-02-17 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:70 N:0 |
2020-02-12 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-10 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC |
2020-02-08 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2020-01-31 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-23 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SPAC/SJC |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |