NM SB60 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 72
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 72
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Fiduciary Access To Digital Assets
Title
Uniform Fiduciary Access To Digital Assets
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Wirth [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-19 | Senate | [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 72 |
2017-02-19 | Senate | [LD 34] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (62-0) |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Judiciary |
2017-01-27 | Senate | [LD 11] Passed Senate (41-0) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | [LD 10] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |