NM SB587 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 52] Passed House (37-30) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 52] Passed House (37-30) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State school grades council
Title
State school grades council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 37 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 23 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 23 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] Passed House (37-30) Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Referred to House Education |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Passed Senate (23-18) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Floor amendment adopted |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Education |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance |