NM SB58 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - [LD 9] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - [LD 9] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Vocational Rehabilitation Act
Title
Vocational Rehabilitation Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Senate | [LD 9] Action postponed indefinitely |
2018-01-31 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-01-31 | Senate | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Rules |
2018-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-17 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=58&year=18 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/18%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0058.pdf |