NM SB56 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-10 - [LD 23] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 50
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-10 - [LD 23] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 50
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local Gov't Treasurer Investments
Title
Local Gov't Treasurer Investments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | Senate | [LD 23] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 50 |
2016-02-10 | House | [LD 23] Passed House (61-0) |
2016-02-05 | House | [LD 18] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-04 | House | [LD 17] Referred to House Ways & Means |
2016-02-09 | Senate | [LD 22] Passed Senate (35-2) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | [LD 18] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Finance |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |